AZ SB1439 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Breast implant surgery; informed consent

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Breast implant surgery; informed consent

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-03-10HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-09HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-03-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-19SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2020-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2020-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
323228New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73728
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1439p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1439s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.1439brophy mcgee.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1439hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1439floorugenti-rita.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.1439butler.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73728&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73728&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73728&billStatusActionId=194255&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73728&billStatusActionId=194513&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73728&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback