AZ SB1437 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana fund; opioid treatment
Title
Medical marijuana fund; opioid treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Medical Marijuana
Medical Marijuana Fund
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rfe
Substance Use Disorder Services Fund
Three-fourths Vote
Transfer Of Monies
Medical Marijuana Fund
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rfe
Substance Use Disorder Services Fund
Three-fourths Vote
Transfer Of Monies