AZ SB1437 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Chapter 138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Agencies; review; GRRC; occupational regulation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agencies; review; GRRC; occupational regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05SenateChapter 138
2017-04-05SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-30SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-03-30HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-20-6-0)
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-03-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-03-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-03-13HouseHouse MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-07HouseHouse read second time
2017-03-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-03-06HouseAssigned to House MVRA Committee
2017-03-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0)
2017-02-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-15SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2017-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411092.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411092.08Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69280
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1437p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1437s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0138.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.14370312.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1437gov.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1437barto1204.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69280&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69280&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69280&billStatusActionId=175935&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69280&billStatusActionId=175423&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69280&billStatusActionId=175605&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69280&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69280&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69280&billStatusActionId=176789&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69280&billStatusActionId=176793&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback