AZ SB1435 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 342
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 342
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Racing commission; continuation; conforming changes
Title
Racing commission; continuation; conforming changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Chapter 342 | |
2016-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (25-4-1-0) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-04-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-7-4-0) |
2016-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) |
2016-03-15 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (14-0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate NR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate NR Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NR Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |