AZ SB1434 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Information technology; consolidated purchasing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Information technology; consolidated purchasing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-17 Governor Vetoed
2016-05-06 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-06SenateSenate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0)
2016-05-06SenateSenate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2016-05-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-05-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-05-06HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-05-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0)
2016-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-03-29HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-29HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-28HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0)
2016-03-14HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-23HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-1-0-3-0)
2016-03-15HouseReferred to House APPROP Committee
2016-03-15HouseHouse read second time
2016-03-14HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-03-14HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2016-03-14HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-03-10SenateTransmit to House
2016-03-10SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-4-1-0)
2016-03-10SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-03-10SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-10SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-02-01SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-16SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2016-02-01SenateReferred to Senate APPROP Committee
2016-02-17SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2016-02-02SenateReferred to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-02SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2016-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=SB1434
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1434p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1434s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1434h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/1434shooter301.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1434.sapprop.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1434.sgov.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1434.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1434.happrop.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1434.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1434.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1434.sfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback