AZ SB1432 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Chapter 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Chapter 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Political signs; removal date
Title
Political signs; removal date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 284 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2021-04-12 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2021-04-12 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-31-0-0) |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-22 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-18 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-2-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |