AZ SB1432 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Chapter 129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Ranchers; landowners; fire training

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ranchers; landowners; fire training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenateChapter 129
2018-04-03SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-02SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-04-02SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-02SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-03-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-01HouseHouse LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-15HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-05SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2018-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
371308New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70616
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1432p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1432s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1432h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0129.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70616&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70616&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70616&billStatusActionId=180892&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70616&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70616&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70616&billStatusActionId=182726&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70616&billStatusActionId=182775&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70616&billStatusActionId=182853&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70616&billStatusActionId=182867&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback