AZ SB1430 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - House Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (17-37-5-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - House Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (17-37-5-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Municipalities; wastewater fees; vacant land
Title
Municipalities; wastewater fees; vacant land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (FAILED) (Y: 17 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (17-37-5-0) |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-15 | House | House LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Cities And Towns
Municipalities
Nonresident Tax Credit
Taxable Year
Taxation Of Income
Vacant Land
Wastewater Fees
Municipalities
Nonresident Tax Credit
Taxable Year
Taxation Of Income
Vacant Land
Wastewater Fees