AZ SB1430 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - House third reading , voting: (20-39-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - House third reading , voting: (20-39-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicles; towing
Title
Motor vehicles; towing
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | House third reading , voting: (20-39-1-0) | |
2011-04-14 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-1-4-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-04-07 | House BI Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2011-03-24 | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-1-0-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-03-22 | House read second time | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-16 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-10 | Senate third reading , voting: (9-21-0-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Consent Calendar February 22, 2011 @ 9:55 AM with Objections | |
2011-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |