AZ SB1429 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Solid waste services; private provider
Title
Solid waste services; private provider
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | Chapter 149 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Collection (h)
Criminal Penalty
Local Regulation (h)
Private Provider
Services
Solid Waste
Solid Waste Services (h)
The Environment - Title 49
Criminal Penalty
Local Regulation (h)
Private Provider
Services
Solid Waste
Solid Waste Services (h)
The Environment - Title 49