AZ SB1428 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Political subdivisions; gun shows; preemption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political subdivisions; gun shows; preemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06 Governor Vetoed
2023-04-03 Transmitted to Governor
2023-03-30SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-03-30HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0)
2023-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2023-03-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2023-03-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-03-15HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2023-03-08HouseHouse read second time
2023-03-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-03-07HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2023-03-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-03-02HouseTransmit to House
2023-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
2023-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2023-02-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-13SenateSenate consent calendar
2023-02-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2023-02-09SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2023-02-02SenateSenate read second time
2023-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2023-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133108Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/79084
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1428p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1428s.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503485
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506591
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506799
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507754
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508373
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508390
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508303
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508661
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79084&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79084&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79084&billStatusActionId=216775&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79084&billStatusActionId=216911&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79084&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79084&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79084&billStatusActionId=218211&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79084&billStatusActionId=218234&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback