AZ SB1425 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - House JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Dependency; special advocate; liability

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dependency; special advocate; liability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-03-05HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-04HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2020-03-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2020-02-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-20SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0)
2020-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2020-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8523Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback