AZ SB1417 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Chapter 377
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health care directives; contact orders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care directives; contact orders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Motion Representative Osborne moved that pursuant to Rule 12 (O), SB 1417 be calendared for Additional Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21SenateChapter 377
2021-05-21SenateGovernor Signed
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-05-17SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-0-1-0)
2021-05-17SenateSenate concurs
2021-05-17SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2021-05-17SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2021-05-13SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-05-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2021-05-13HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-05-04HouseHouse refer to additional Committee of the Whole
2021-04-12HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-22HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-1-0-0-0)
2021-03-08HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-04HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-01HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2021-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-18SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2021-01-28SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-27SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
363211New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75454
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1417p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1417s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1417h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0377.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.14170212.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1417hhs.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484566
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485240
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487456
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487767
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489603
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489647
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489652
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75454&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75454&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75454&billStatusActionId=201835&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75454&billStatusActionId=202019&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75454&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75454&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75454&billStatusActionId=203645&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75454&billStatusActionId=203987&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75454&billStatusActionId=204050&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75454&billStatusActionId=204068&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75454&billStatusActionId=204088&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75454&billStatusActionId=204090&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback