AZ SB1414 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Chapter 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Chapter 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certified applicators; fingerprinting requirement
Title
Certified applicators; fingerprinting requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 283 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-3-0-0) |
2021-04-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Agriculture - Title 3
Certified Applicator
Fingerprinting
Pest Management
Qualified Applicators
Requirements
Certified Applicator
Fingerprinting
Pest Management
Qualified Applicators
Requirements
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 3603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 3614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |