AZ SB1412 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Probation; prisoners; protective orders
Title
Probation; prisoners; protective orders
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 273 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-04-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Board Of Executive Clemency
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Code - Title 13
Prisoners
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Probation
Prohibition
Protective Orders
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Code - Title 13
Prisoners
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Probation
Prohibition
Protective Orders
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 411.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |