AZ SB1412 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-21)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Unclaimed property; electric cooperatives; credits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unclaimed property; electric cooperatives; credits

Sponsors

Sen. Gail Griffin [R]Sen. Sylvia Allen [R]Sen. Nancy Barto [R]Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R]
Sen. Sean Bowie [D]Sen. David Bradley [D]Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R]Sen. Judy Burges [R]
Sen. Olivia Bedford [D]Sen. Lupe Contreras [D]Sen. Andrea Dalessandro [D]Rep. Karen Fann [R]
Sen. Steve Farley [D]Sen. David Farnsworth [R]Rep. Rick Gray [R]Sen. Katie Hobbs [D]
Sen. John Kavanagh [R]Sen. Sine Kerr [R]Sen. Juan Mendez [D]Sen. Robert Meza [D]
Sen. Catherine Miranda [D]Sen. Lisa Otondo [D]Sen. Jamescita Peshlakai [D]Sen. Warren Petersen [R]
Rep. Franklin Pratt [R]Sen. Martin Quezada [D]Sen. Steve Smith [R]Sen. Bob Worsley [R]
Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R]Sen. Kimberly Yee [R]Rep. John Allen [R]Sen. Nancy Barto [R]
Rep. Wenona Benally [D]Rep. Russell Bowers [R]Rep. Noel Campbell [R]Rep. Ken Clark [D]
Rep. Todd Clodfelter [R]Rep. Regina Cobb [R]Rep. Douglas Coleman [R]Rep. David Cook [R]
Rep. Eric Descheenie [D]Rep. Kirsten Engel [D]Rep. Diego Espinoza [D]Rep. Edwin Farnsworth [R]
Rep. Mark Finchem [R]Rep. Travis Grantham [R]Rep. Daniel Hernandez [D]Rep. Drew John [R]
Rep. Anthony Kern [R]Rep. Jay Lawrence [R]Rep. Vince Leach [R]Rep. David Livingston [R]
Rep. Ray Martinez [D]Rep. Darin Mitchell [R]Rep. Paul Mosley [R]Rep. Jill Norgaard [R]
Rep. Becky Nutt [R]Rep. Geraldine Peten [D]Sen. Don Shooter [R]Rep. Thomas Shope [R]
Rep. David Stringer [R]Rep. Maria Syms [R]Rep. Bob Thorpe [R]Rep. Ben Toma [R]
Rep. Kelly Townsend [R]Rep. Michelle Udall [R]

Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23SenateChapter 59
2018-03-23SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-21SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-20SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-06HouseHouse EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-22HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to House EENR Committee
2018-02-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-15HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-07SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
102071New CodeSee Bill Text
44321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44329Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70585
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1412p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1412s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0059.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70585&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70585&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70585&billStatusActionId=180893&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70585&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70585&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70585&billStatusActionId=182574&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback