AZ SB1412 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Accelerated depreciation; class 6 property
Title
Accelerated depreciation; class 6 property
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] | Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Sen. John McComish [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] | Rep. Justin Pierce [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2014-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-1-0) |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-1-5-0) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |