AZ SB1411 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Chapter 275
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; annual achievement profiles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; annual achievement profiles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Amend (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateChapter 275
2018-05-02SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-26SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-23SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-18SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2018-04-18HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-19HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-03-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-06HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-05SenateSenate motion to amend
2018-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-08SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15241.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70579
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1411p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1411s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1411h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0275.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1411allen s1025.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1411quezada1210.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70579&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70579&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70579&billStatusActionId=181117&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70579&billStatusActionId=182287&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70579&billStatusActionId=182292&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70579&billStatusActionId=182329&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70579&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70579&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70579&billStatusActionId=183308&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70579&billStatusActionId=183333&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70579&billStatusActionId=183388&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70579&billStatusActionId=183390&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback