AZ SB1411 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Industries for blind; repeal; successor
Title
Industries for blind; repeal; successor
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Chapter 341 | |
2016-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2016-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |