AZ SB1406 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Aircraft registration; taxation; repeal; appropriation
Title
Aircraft registration; taxation; repeal; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Aircraft
Aircraft Registration And Taxation
Application
Appropriation
Aviation Fuel Tax
Department Of Transportation
Fees
Heading Change
Registration
Repeal
Taxation
Transportation - Title 28
Aircraft Registration And Taxation
Application
Appropriation
Aviation Fuel Tax
Department Of Transportation
Fees
Heading Change
Registration
Repeal
Taxation
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 8323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8324 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8327 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8328 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8329 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8330 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8335 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8336 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8337 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8338 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8339 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8340 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8341 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8342 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8343 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8345 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8347 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8383 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |