AZ SB1406 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House third reading FAILED voting: (28-31-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House third reading FAILED voting: (28-31-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; audit findings; financial penalty
Title
Schools; audit findings; financial penalty
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] |
Sen. Kelli Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (28-31-1-0) |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-0-2-0) |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-14-1-0) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |