AZ SB1405 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Corporate income tax allocation; sales

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporate income tax allocation; sales

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateChapter 106
2018-03-29SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-3-1-0)
2018-03-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-14HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-27HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2018-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-22HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-14SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431147Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70573
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1405p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1405s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0106.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.14050954.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1405fin.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70573&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70573&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70573&billStatusActionId=181533&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70573&billStatusActionId=181615&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70573&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70573&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70573&billStatusActionId=182632&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback