AZ SB1404 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility; early voting; list
Title
Eligibility; early voting; list
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 1018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 246 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 510 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 543 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 544 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 547 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 558.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |