AZ SB1404 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-17-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-17-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupational regulation; municipalities; counties
Title
Occupational regulation; municipalities; counties
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-17-1-0) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-1-0) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
County Licensing Authority
Municipalities
Occupational Fee
Occupational Licensing Regulation
Occupational Regulation
Counties - Title 11
County Licensing Authority
Municipalities
Occupational Fee
Occupational Licensing Regulation
Occupational Regulation