AZ SB1403 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Literacy; dyslexia screening
Title
Literacy; dyslexia screening
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. Sean Bowie [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Definitions (h)
Dyslexia
Education - Title 15
Endorsement
Funding (h)
K-3 Reading Program (h)
Literacy
Program Termination (h)
Report (h)
Retroactivity
School Instruction
Screening
Teaching Certificates (h)
Dyslexia
Education - Title 15
Endorsement
Funding (h)
K-3 Reading Program (h)
Literacy
Program Termination (h)
Report (h)
Retroactivity
School Instruction
Screening
Teaching Certificates (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |