AZ SB1403 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Pharmacy board; permittee operations; fees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy board; permittee operations; fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseHouse RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-21HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RA Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0)
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-20SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2019-02-06SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321901.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321924Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321930Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321931Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321941Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321982Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411758Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
411758.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41619.51Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72057
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1403p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1403s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1403carter.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1403hhs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72057&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72057&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72057&billStatusActionId=187190&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72057&billStatusActionId=187229&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72057&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72057&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback