AZ SB1400 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

County water supply provision; renewal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County water supply provision; renewal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Energy Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-09 Governor Vetoed
2016-05-04 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-04SenateSenate final reading , voting: (16-12-2-0)
2016-05-04SenateSenate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2016-04-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-07HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-04-07HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-25-4-0)
2016-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2016-03-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2016-03-01HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-17HouseHouse AWL Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-2-0)
2016-03-02HouseReferred to House AWL Committee
2016-03-02HouseHouse read second time
2016-03-01HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-03-01HouseAssigned to House AWL Committee
2016-03-01HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-02-25SenateTransmit to House
2016-02-25SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0)
2016-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-02-01SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-15SenateSenate WE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2016-02-02SenateReferred to Senate WE Committee
2016-02-02SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate WE Committee
2016-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=SB1400
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1400p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1400s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1400h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/s.1400gg.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/s.1400we.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1400.swe.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1400.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1400.hawl.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1400.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1400.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1400.sfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback