AZ SB1398 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Chapter 120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Miniature scooters; electric standup scooters

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Miniature scooters; electric standup scooters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateChapter 120
2019-04-22SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-16SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-16SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-04-16SenateSenate concurs
2019-04-16SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-11SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-04-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-25HouseHouse RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-07HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to House RA Committee
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2019-03-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-03-04HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13SenateSenate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2019-02-05SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-04SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28627Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28819Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72044
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1398p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1398s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1398h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0120.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1398floorpace.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1398thorpe.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1398transportation.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72044&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72044&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72044&billStatusActionId=187394&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72044&billStatusActionId=187631&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72044&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72044&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72044&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72044&billStatusActionId=188912&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72044&billStatusActionId=188920&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72044&billStatusActionId=188976&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72044&billStatusActionId=188984&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback