AZ SB1394 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Charter schools; training; information; procurement
Title
Charter schools; training; information; procurement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Sen. Otondo to include Dalessandro flr. amend (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Sen. Otondo to include Quezada flr. amend. (ref Ed) and exclude Brophy McGee flr. amend. (ref Ed) (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Sen. Otondo to include Dalessandro flr. amend (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Sen. Otondo to include Quezada flr. amend. (ref Ed) and exclude Brophy McGee flr. amend. (ref Ed) (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate motion to amend |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate motion to amend |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Charter School Governing Body
Charter School Sponsors
Charter School Transparency And Accountability Act
Charter Schools
Education - Title 15
Governing Body
Postings
Procurement
Strike Everything Amendment
Training
Charter School Sponsors
Charter School Transparency And Accountability Act
Charter Schools
Education - Title 15
Governing Body
Postings
Procurement
Strike Everything Amendment
Training
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 182 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 183.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |