AZ SB1394 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

DHS; reporting; abortions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS; reporting; abortions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateChapter 219
2018-04-12SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-11SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (17-13-0-0)
2018-04-11SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-10SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-10SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-22-3-0)
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-14HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-03-05HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-05HouseHouse FPRPP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-01HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-01HouseAssigned to House FPRPP Committee
2018-03-01HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-22HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-14SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362162.01New CodeSee Bill Text
362163Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70560
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1394p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1394s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1394h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0219.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.13940200.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1394hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1394rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1394farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1394judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70560&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70560&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70560&billStatusActionId=181563&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70560&billStatusActionId=181614&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70560&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70560&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70560&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70560&billStatusActionId=183108&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70560&billStatusActionId=183138&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70560&billStatusActionId=183206&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70560&billStatusActionId=183258&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback