AZ SB1392 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-07 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-07 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mexican gray wolf; interstate compact
Title
Mexican gray wolf; interstate compact
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] |
Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Sen. Michele Reagan [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-07 | House read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-8-1-0) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Senate BSFSS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |