AZ SB1392 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

TPT; digital goods and services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TPT; digital goods and services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2018-02-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-14SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
425001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
426015New CodeSee Bill Text
441263Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback