AZ SB1390 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water infrastructure finance authority; amendments
Title
Water infrastructure finance authority; amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Chapter 197 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (23-5-2-0) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-10-1-0) |
2023-05-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-03-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-14 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Amendment (h)
Amendments
Authority
Conduct Of Office
Definition
Emergency
Emergency Clause
Exemption From Liability
Federal Water Programs Committee
Finance Authority
Fingerprinting
Initial Terms
Laws 2022
Long-term Water Augmentation Fund
Membership
Powers And Duties
Procedures
Recommendations
Requirements
Terms
The Environment - Title 49
Water Conservation Grant Fund
Water Infrastructure
Water Infrastructure Finance Authority (h)
Water Infrastructure Finance Authority (wifa)
Waters - Title 45
Amendments
Authority
Conduct Of Office
Definition
Emergency
Emergency Clause
Exemption From Liability
Federal Water Programs Committee
Finance Authority
Fingerprinting
Initial Terms
Laws 2022
Long-term Water Augmentation Fund
Membership
Powers And Duties
Procedures
Recommendations
Requirements
Terms
The Environment - Title 49
Water Conservation Grant Fund
Water Infrastructure
Water Infrastructure Finance Authority (h)
Water Infrastructure Finance Authority (wifa)
Waters - Title 45
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 1203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 1206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 1207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 1270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 1307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 1309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 1333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |