AZ SB1390 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Committee and program termination; repeal
Title
Committee and program termination; repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 44 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-03-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-14 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Child Safety - Title 8
Committee And Program Termination
Education - Title 15
Labor - Title 23
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Repeal
State Government - Title 41
Trade And Commerce - Title 44
Transportation - Title 28
Committee And Program Termination
Education - Title 15
Labor - Title 23
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Repeal
State Government - Title 41
Trade And Commerce - Title 44
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 216 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 2401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 249 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 249.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 552 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 720.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 215 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7011 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 287 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1694 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2905.07 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 3607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 766.09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 112 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 113 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1609.05 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1609.06 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 197 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 4254 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 4256 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 332 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 830 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |