AZ SB1390 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2158

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-21)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

TPT; additional rate; education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TPT; additional rate; education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26SenateChapter 74
2018-03-26SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-22SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (53-6-1-0)
2018-03-22HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-22SenateSenate third reading None voting: (26-4-0-0)
2018-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-22SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2018-03-20SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2158 (Replaces) 2018-03-22 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
151472Amended CodeSee Bill Text
151648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15241.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15971Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15977Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425010.01New CodeSee Bill Text
425029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425029.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425029.02New CodeSee Bill Text
425155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431072.02New CodeSee Bill Text
43222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43323Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70552
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1390p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1390s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0074.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.13900253.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1390ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1390farley0936.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70552&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70552&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70552&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70552&billStatusActionId=182619&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70552&billStatusActionId=182625&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70552&billStatusActionId=182640&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback