AZ SB1382 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
TPT; online lodging marketplace; registration
Title
TPT; online lodging marketplace; registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - Motion (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - Motion (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 189 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-04-05 | House | House third reading None voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-04-05 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-03 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-03 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-02 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-04-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-03-28 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-4-0-0) |
2018-03-19 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | House WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 5005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 4204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |