AZ SB1381 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Disability-selection abortion; prohibited
Title
Disability-selection abortion; prohibited
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |