AZ SB1378 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Internet sex offender website; offenses
Title
Internet sex offender website; offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA ON RECON) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA ON RECON) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee action: do pass amended on reconsideration, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-16 | House | House JUD Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (5-5-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Assigned to House Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-3-2-0) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Applicability
Criminal Code - Title 13
Internet Sex Offender Website
Offenses
Registration Of Sex Offenders
Criminal Code - Title 13
Internet Sex Offender Website
Offenses
Registration Of Sex Offenders