AZ SB1378 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibited money transfers; immigration; violations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibited money transfers; immigration; violations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-22SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0)
2016-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-02-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-01-28SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-03SenateSenate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-1-0)
2016-02-01SenateReferred to Senate PSMT Committee
2016-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2016-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate PSMT Committee
2016-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback