AZ SB1377 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - House HEALTH Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-5-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Dental therapy; licensure; regulation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental therapy; licensure; regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Health Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-5-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-01HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-28HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-21HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-21SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (22-8-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-15SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0)
2018-02-07SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321201.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321263.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321264Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321299Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411758Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411758.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41619.51Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70526
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1377p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1377s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.13770248.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1377hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1377allen s2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1377allen s.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1377ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1377barto0541.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1377allen s0913.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70526&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70526&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70526&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70526&billStatusActionId=181371&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70526&billStatusActionId=181397&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70526&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback