AZ SB1377 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - House third reading FAILED voting: (28-32-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Sentence enhancements; unlawful presence; release

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentence enhancements; unlawful presence; release

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (28-32-0-0)
2016-04-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-04-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-1-0)
2016-03-03HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-29HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn
2016-03-17HouseReferred to House APPROP Committee
2016-03-17HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Withdrawn
2016-03-09HouseReferred to House JUD Committee
2016-03-17HouseHouse MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0)
2016-03-07HouseReferred to House MAPS Committee
2016-03-07HouseHouse read second time
2016-03-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-03-17HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2016-03-09HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2016-03-03HouseAssigned to House MAPS Committee
2016-03-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-02-22SenateTransmit to House
2016-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0)
2016-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-01-28SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-03SenateSenate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-0-0)
2016-02-01SenateReferred to Senate PSMT Committee
2016-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2016-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate PSMT Committee
2016-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=SB1377
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1377p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1377s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1377h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/s.13770854.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/s.1377psmt.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/1377smith0850.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.1377borrelli.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/h.1377military affairs and public safety.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1377.spsmt.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1377.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1377.hmaps.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1377.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1377.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1377.hthird.2.asp

Bill Comments

feedback