AZ SB1375 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Study committee; retirement savings programs
Title
Study committee; retirement savings programs
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | Chapter 214 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (24-3-3-0) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-9-7-0) |
2022-04-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-04-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-04-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-04-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-28 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | House | House GE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-4-4-0) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-2-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Work And Save Program
Confidentiality
Employers
Exception
Intergovernmental Agreement
Memorandum Of Understanding
Participant And Account Information
Program Development And Implementation
Program Requirements
Protection From Liability
Public Finances - Title 35
Public-private Partnerships Retirement Savings Programs (h)
Retirement Savings Program
Severability
State Management Of Monies
State Treasurer
Study Committee (h)
Work And Save Fund
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Work And Save Program
Confidentiality
Employers
Exception
Intergovernmental Agreement
Memorandum Of Understanding
Participant And Account Information
Program Development And Implementation
Program Requirements
Protection From Liability
Public Finances - Title 35
Public-private Partnerships Retirement Savings Programs (h)
Retirement Savings Program
Severability
State Management Of Monies
State Treasurer
Study Committee (h)
Work And Save Fund