AZ SB1375 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; bonds; overrides; funding sources
Title
Schools; bonds; overrides; funding sources
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. David Farnsworth [R] |
Sen. Warren Petersen [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 481 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |