AZ SB1375 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral health services; dependent children
Title
Behavioral health services; dependent children
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Katie Hobbs [D] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Sen. Kelli Ward [R] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Reform and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Reform and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-11 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-06-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2013-06-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-05-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-21 | House | House RHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to House RHS Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RHS Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |