AZ SB1373 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Chapter 314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health facilities; duty of care

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health facilities; duty of care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateChapter 314
2021-05-04SenateGovernor Signed
2021-04-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-28SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-1-0-0)
2021-04-28SenateSenate concurs
2021-04-27SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2021-04-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2021-04-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-04-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2021-04-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-03-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-31HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-22HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-02HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-03-01HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-23HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-5-0-0)
2021-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-10SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-0)
2021-01-27SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36420New CodeSee Bill Text
36420.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75396
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1373p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1373s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1373h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0314.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1373barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1373pace.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1373hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1373floorbarto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.1373osborne.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483561
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484185
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485287
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485288
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485357
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485911
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485912
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485913
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487454
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487935
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489180
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75396&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75396&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75396&billStatusActionId=201147&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75396&billStatusActionId=201387&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75396&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75396&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75396&billStatusActionId=203793&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75396&billStatusActionId=203825&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75396&billStatusActionId=203907&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75396&billStatusActionId=203911&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback