AZ SB1372 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Dental board; anesthesia; sedation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental board; anesthesia; sedation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-03HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-03-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-01HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (21-8-1-0)
2021-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-18SenateSenate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-1-0)
2021-01-27SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321207Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75395
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1372p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1372s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1372barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.13720121.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1372hhs.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483560
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485125
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486157
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486166
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75395&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75395&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75395&billStatusActionId=201833&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75395&billStatusActionId=202013&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback