AZ SB1371 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Acupuncture board; members; auricular acupuncture
Title
Acupuncture board; members; auricular acupuncture
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Acupuncture
Acupuncture Board
Ahcccs
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Eligibility
Members
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Renewal
Strike Everything Amendment
Acupuncture Board
Ahcccs
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Eligibility
Members
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Renewal
Strike Everything Amendment