AZ SB1370 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental quality; program terminations; repeal
Title
Environmental quality; program terminations; repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 69 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Administration (h)
Administrative Costs
Appointments (h)
Appropriating Monies
Commission
Contaminants
Contracts
Department Of Environmental Quality (h)
Emergency
Emergency Clause
Environmental Laboratories
Environmental Quality
Exemption (h)
Federal Safe Drinking Water Act
Fees
Fund
Funding
Minerals, Oil And Gas - Title 27
Monitoring Assistance
Monitoring Programs
Nonprofit Organizations
Organic Chemicals (h)
Permit (h)
Powers (h)
Program Termination
Public Water Systems
Repeal
Retroactivity
Safe Drinking Water Program Fund (h)
State Government - Title 41
The Environment - Title 49
Water Systems
Administrative Costs
Appointments (h)
Appropriating Monies
Commission
Contaminants
Contracts
Department Of Environmental Quality (h)
Emergency
Emergency Clause
Environmental Laboratories
Environmental Quality
Exemption (h)
Federal Safe Drinking Water Act
Fees
Fund
Funding
Minerals, Oil And Gas - Title 27
Monitoring Assistance
Monitoring Programs
Nonprofit Organizations
Organic Chemicals (h)
Permit (h)
Powers (h)
Program Termination
Public Water Systems
Repeal
Retroactivity
Safe Drinking Water Program Fund (h)
State Government - Title 41
The Environment - Title 49
Water Systems
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3022.09 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3022.24 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 186 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 238 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 360 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |