AZ SB1369 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; public roadways
Title
Technical correction; public roadways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |