AZ SB1368 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Chapter 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Chapter 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Continuation; Arizona board of regents
Title
Continuation; Arizona board of regents
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] | Sen. Tyler Pace [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | Chapter 326 |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (20-5-5-0) |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-17-8-0) |
2022-06-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-06-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-22 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-9-2-0) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Abor (see Also: Arizona Board Of Regents)
Arizona Board Of Regents (abor)
Continuation
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Termination
Arizona Board Of Regents (abor)
Continuation
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Termination
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3022.12 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3027.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |